AB299 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 15, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cohen, Jauregui, Ohrenschall, Swank

Requires the Legislative Committee on Senior Citizens, Veterans and Adults with Special Needs to conduct a study concerning training standards for unlicensed persons providing care at certain facilities or homes or through certain agencies or providers. (BDR S-985)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 279.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2017     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 08, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 428     Amend. No. 752   

Bill History

Mar 15, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 16, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 21, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 428.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 752.) To printer.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.

May 25, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 752 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 279.

Effective July 1, 2017.