AB304 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2017.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to autism. (BDR 38-363)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 280.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 24, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 07, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 03, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 25, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 753   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 17, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 19, 2017

  • Read second time.

Apr 20, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 21, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 753.) To printer.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.

May 25, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 753 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 280.

Effective July 1, 2017.