AB307 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oscarson, Sprinkle

Revises provisions governing emergency medical services at special events. (BDR 40-928)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 27, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2017     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 269   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 17, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 269.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 27, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)