AB31 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to the Specialist for the Rights of Elderly Persons and the Community Advocate for Elder Rights. (BDR 38-130)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 41.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb 17, 2017     12:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 22, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 03, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 19, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 10, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 09, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 16, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 07, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 08, 2017

  • Read second time.

Mar 09, 2017

Mar 10, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 11, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2017

May 17, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 18, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 41.
  • Effective May 19, 2017.