AB319 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 17, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Sprinkle, Harris

Revises provisions governing the guardianship of minors. (BDR 13-502)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 172.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 10, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 13, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 08, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 12, 2017     12:00 PM      Agenda            Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     May 15, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 16, 2017     06:00 PM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 343   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 20, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 343.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 15, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2017

  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 172.
  • Effective July 1, 2017.