AB32 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining

Revises provisions governing pest control. (BDR 49-176)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 80.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar 02, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr 13, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Natural Resources     May 02, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 11, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 333   

Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 333.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

May 03, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 04, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 05, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for Tuesday, May 9, 2017.

May 09, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2017

May 15, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 17, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 23, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 80.

Sections 2 to 41, inclusive, and 43, 44, and 45 of this act effective on July 1, 2017. Section 42 of this act becomes effective on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who (a) have failed to comply with the subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or (b) are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States.