AB339 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodbury, Hardy

Revises provisions relating to health care. (BDR 54-729)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 425.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 29, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 31, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 10, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 17, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 2


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 539     Amend. No. 781   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 21, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 539.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 781.) To printer.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 781 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 06, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 425.
  • Effective July 1, 2017.