AB346 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Joiner

Enacts requirements relating to certain providers of child care. (BDR 38-283)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 03, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 01, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 08, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda            Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 10, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 29,   Nay 13,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 15,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 219     Amend. No. 573     Amend. No. 908   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 21, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 219.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 573.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) To Senate.

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 11, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 24, 2017

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 908.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.)
  • To printer.

May 25, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 908 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.