AB347 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Joiner

Establishes certain requirements relating to surgical technologists. (BDR 40-721)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 78.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 01, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 10, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 25, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 16, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 19, 2017

  • Read second time.

Apr 20, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 21, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 11, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2017

May 17, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 18, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 23, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 78.

Effective May 23, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.