AB348 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Joiner

Revises provisions governing a course or unit of a course of instruction concerning acquired immune deficiency syndrome, the human reproductive system, related communicable diseases and sexual responsibility. (BDR 34-285)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Feb 06, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda            
  Assembly Education     Apr 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Education     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 01, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 08, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 26, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     Jun 01, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Jun 03, 2017     05:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2017   Yea 28,   Nay 12,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 04, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 473     Amend. No. 976   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 473.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 30, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 976.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 2.)
  • To printer.

May 31, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

Jun 03, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 04, 2017

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Vetoed by the Governor.

Return to 2019 Session.