AB366 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Araujo, Bustamante Adams, Frierson, Thompson, Yeager, Paul Anderson, Benitez-Thompson, Carlton, Joiner, Monroe-Moreno, Oscarson, Sprinkle, Woodhouse, Ford, Ratti, Gansert, Kieckhefer, Cancela, Hardy, Harris, Manendo

Creates four behavioral health regions in this State and a regional behavioral health policy board for each region. (BDR 39-987)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 479.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 27, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 07, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 22, 2017     05:00 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 23, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Do pass, as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 31, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 02, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 194   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 194.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

May 25, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 01, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 02, 2017

Jun 03, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 479.

Effective July 1, 2017.