AB374 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Sprinkle, Frierson, Araujo, Carlton, Cohen, Elliot Anderson, Benitez-Thompson, Bilbray-Axelrod, Brooks, Bustamante Adams, Carrillo, Daly, Diaz, Flores, Fumo, Jauregui, Joiner, McCurdy II, Miller, Neal, Ohrenschall, Spiegel, Swank, Thompson, Watkins, Yeager

Requires the Department of Health and Human Services, if authorized by federal law, to establish a health care plan within Medicaid for purchase by persons who are not otherwise eligible for Medicaid. (BDR 38-881)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
To committee.

Upcoming Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means      May 24, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda   Heard

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 07, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Not heard
  Senate Finance     Apr 28, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 745   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.

May 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 745.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

May 22, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.