AB382 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carlton, Frierson, Araujo, Spiegel, Benitez-Thompson, Sprinkle, Ford, Parks, Cancela

Establishes provisions governing payment for the provision of emergency services and care to patients. (BDR 40-570)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 27, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 30, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Health and Human Services     Jun 02, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Jun 03, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 31, 2017   Yea 31,   Nay 10,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 04, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 427     Amend. No. 1065   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 427.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 31, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1065.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 10, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

Jun 01, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 03, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 04, 2017

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Vetoed by the Governor.

Return to 2019 Session.