AB385 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Yeager, Araujo, McCurdy II, Watkins, Diaz, Benitez-Thompson, Flores, Jauregui, Joiner, Cannizzaro, Cancela

Provides for the issuance of free annual permits to fifth graders to enter state parks and recreational areas. (BDR 35-656)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 17.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar 28, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr 06, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 27, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 13, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 02, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 180   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 180.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2017

Apr 17, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

Apr 28, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 01, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 02, 2017

May 05, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 09, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 12, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 17.

Effective May 12, 2017, for the purpose of performing any administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on July 1, 2017, for all other purposes.