AB387 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Benitez-Thompson

Revises provisions relating to social workers. (BDR 54-540)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 14.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 24, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 07, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Do pass
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 19, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 13, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 01, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Read second time.

Apr 13, 2017

Apr 17, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Apr 26, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 27, 2017

  • Read second time.

Apr 28, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 01, 2017

May 02, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 08, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 14.

Effective July 1, 2018, and expires by limitation on June 30, 2026.