AB388 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Benitez-Thompson

Making an appropriation for the Women's Health Connection Program. (BDR S-915)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 432.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 10, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Jun 03, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 31, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 04, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 1036   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2017

  • Notice of exemption.

May 31, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1036.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

Jun 01, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 03, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 04, 2017

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 432.

Effective July 1, 2017.