AB4 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 15, 2016.
By: Judiciary

Repeals provisions relating to reciprocal enforcement of support orders with foreign countries or political subdivisions. (BDR 11-175)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 34.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 10, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 01, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 13, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 01, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     May 04, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 03, 2017   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 11, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Nov 15, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 01, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 02, 2017

  • Read second time.

Mar 03, 2017

Mar 06, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 08, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 11, 2017

May 15, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 17, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 34.

Effective May 19, 2017.