AB408 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Joiner, Spiegel, Bilbray-Axelrod, Fumo, Sprinkle, Araujo, Benitez-Thompson, Brooks, Bustamante Adams, Carlton, Carrillo, Cohen, Daly, Diaz, Flores, Frierson, McCurdy II, Monroe-Moreno, Neal, Ohrenschall, Swank, Thompson

Revises provisions relating to Medicaid and health insurance. (BDR 38-957)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 07, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2017     12:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 03, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 17, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Reschedule
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 19, 2017     11:51 AM          Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 19, 2017     12:20 PM          Minutes          Rescind previous action on: 5-19-17   Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 27,   Nay 15,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 568     Amend. No. 869     Amend. No. 967   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 21, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 568.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 869.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 967.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Senate Amendment Nos. 869 and 967 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2017

  • Vetoed by the Governor.