AB42 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Government Affairs

Revises various provisions relating to public records. (BDR 19-389)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 16, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)