AB422 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 27, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Araujo

Revises provisions relating to the use of marijuana. (BDR 40-983)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 540.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2017     12:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 03, 2017     06:00 PM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     May 03, 2017     06:00 PM      Agenda            Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 01, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 03, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 03, 2017     08:28 PM          Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 02, 2017   Yea 36,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (4th Reprint)       Jun 05, 2017   Yea 16,   Nay 4,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    4th Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 274     Amend. No. 1073     Amend. No. 1115     Amend. No. 1151   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 28, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 274.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

Jun 02, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1073.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 5, Not voting: 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Jun 04, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1115.) To printer.

Jun 05, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1151.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 4, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment Nos. 1115 and 1151 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 12, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 540.
  • Sections 56.5, 56.9, and 70 of this act effective June 12, 2017. Sections 1 to 56, inclusive, and 57 to 69, inclusive, of this act effective June 12, 2017 for the purposes of adopting any regulations and performing any preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act, and on July 1, 2017, for all other purposes. Section 56.7 of this act effective on January 1, 2020.