AB428 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions governing the acquisition and use of opioid antagonists. (BDR 40-620)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 398.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2017     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 23, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Do pass, as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 31, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 02, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 426   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 28, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 21, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 426.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

May 25, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 01, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 02, 2017

Jun 03, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 398.

Effective June 5, 2017, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on July 1, 2017, for all other purposes.