AB429 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Health and Human Services

Enacts provisions governing the interstate practice of psychology. (BDR 54-351)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 173.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard   Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 03, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 17, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 422   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 422.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 173.

Effective October 1, 2017.