AB440 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 27, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Yeager

Revises provisions governing involuntary commitment proceedings. (BDR 39-997)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 482.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 26, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Heard   Do pass, as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 31, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 02, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 425   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 425.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 26, 2017

May 29, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 01, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 02, 2017

Jun 03, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 482.

Effective October 1, 2017.