AB455 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Commerce and Labor

Authorizes the electronic delivery of certain notices and documents relating to policies of insurance. (BDR 57-112)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 04, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 11, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 01, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 17, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 236   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 236.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.