AB457 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions relating to certain professional licensing boards. (BDR 54-410)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 363.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 17, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 19, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 600     Amend. No. 860   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 600.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 860.) To printer.

May 24, 2017

May 29, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 860 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 363.

Sections 1 to 31, inclusive, 33, 34, 35, 35.5, 36.5, and 37 of this act become effective June 4, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on January 1, 2018, for all other purposes. Sections 32 and 36 of this act become effective on October 1, 2017. Section 6, 14, 22, and 29 of this act and the amendatory provisions of section 9 of this act expire by limitation on December 31, 2019. Section 34.5 of this act becomes effective on January 1, 2020.