AB46 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 17, 2016.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions governing services provided to persons with mental illness and other disabilities. (BDR 39-132)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 269.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb 15, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 22, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 03, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 08, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 39,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 171     Amend. No. 748   

Bill History

Nov 17, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 171.) To printer.

Apr 12, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 748.) To printer.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.

May 25, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 748 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 269.

Effective July 1, 2017. Sections 10, 11, and 12 of this act expire by limitation on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupationa,l and recreational licenses of persons who: (a) have failed to comply with the subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or (b) are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children are repealed by the Congress of the United States.