AB472 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Judiciary

Establishes policies for reducing recidivism rates and improving other outcomes for youth in the juvenile justice system. (BDR 5-918)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 604.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 23, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          BDR mentioned
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 07, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 10, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 11, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 11, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 16, 2017     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 17, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 18, 2017     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 31, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 02, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 231     Amend. No. 844     Amend. No. 1102   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 231.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 844.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Jun 02, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1102.) To printer.

Jun 03, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1102 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 604.

Sections 1 to 32, inclusive, and 34 of this act effective on July 1, 2017. Section 33 of this act effective on July 1, 2018.