AB473 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Health and Human Services

Temporarily provides for the continued inclusion of certain drugs on the list of preferred prescription drugs to be used for the Medicaid program. (BDR 38-977)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Read second time.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2017     12:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 16, 2017     06:00 PM      Agenda            Heard   Do pass, as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 26, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 424   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 424.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 26, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.