AB474 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Health and Human Services

Makes various changes relating to drug overdoses and prescribing and using drugs. (BDR 40-1102)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 605.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 03, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2017     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 08, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 17, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 26, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 15, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 02, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 277   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 277.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 11, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 15, 2017

May 16, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 01, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 02, 2017

Jun 03, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 605.

Effective June 16, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.