AB54 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 17, 2016.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions relating to reports of certain accidents or motor vehicle crashes by employers. (BDR 53-160)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 13.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 17, 2017     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 26, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2017   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 01, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 43   

Bill History

Nov 17, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 17, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 18, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 43.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 21, 2017

Apr 24, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Apr 26, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 27, 2017

  • Read second time.

Apr 28, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 01, 2017

May 02, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 08, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 13.
  • Effective October 1, 2017.