AB55 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 17, 2016.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions relating to evidence collected from and the reimbursement of payment for forensic medical examinations of victims of sexual assault. (BDR 15-387)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 10, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 16, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 12, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Nov 17, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 13, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)