AB65 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 17, 2016.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to medical care for indigent persons. (BDR 38-438)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 184.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 15, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 08, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 08, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 17, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 72   

Bill History

Nov 17, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 05, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 72.) To printer.

Apr 06, 2017

Apr 10, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 16, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 17, 2017

May 18, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 27, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 184.

Effective May 27, 2017.