AB83 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 17, 2016.
By: Commerce and Labor

Makes various changes relating to insurance. (BDR 57-159)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 376.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 22, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 01, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 19, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 35,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 538   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 619   

Bill History

Nov 17, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 538.)
  • Action reconsidered.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 619.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 853.) To printer.

May 24, 2017

May 25, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 853 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 853 receded from.
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To printer.

May 31, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 376.

Sections 98, 110, 112, and 114 of this act effective June 5, 2017. Sections 1 to 97, inclusive, 99 to109, inclusive, 111, 113, 115 to 152, inclusive, 154, 156, 157, and 159 to168, inclusive, and 169 of this act become effective: (a) June 5, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and (b) on July 1, 2017, for all other purposes. Sections 153, 155, and 158 of this act become effective: (a) June 5, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative acts that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and (b) on January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.