AB85 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Jan 27, 2017.
By: Health and Human Services

Requires instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and the use of an automated external defibrillator in certain schools. (BDR 34-569)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 21.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 01, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Education     Apr 20, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 27, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 15, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 02, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Jan 27, 2017

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Jan 30, 2017

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 13, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 14, 2017

  • Read second time.

Mar 15, 2017

Mar 16, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

Apr 28, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 01, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 02, 2017

May 05, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 09, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 15, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 21.
  • Effective July 1, 2017.