AB89 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Jan 30, 2017.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to surgical centers for ambulatory patients. (BDR 40-364)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 131.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2017   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 17, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 423   

Bill History

Jan 30, 2017

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Jan 31, 2017

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 423.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

Apr 24, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 16, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 17, 2017

May 18, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 25, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 131.

Effective July 1, 2017.