AB95 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 01, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Benitez-Thompson

Revises provisions governing child support. (BDR 38-197)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb 20, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2017     12:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2017   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 268   

Bill History

Feb 01, 2017

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 02, 2017

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 268.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

Apr 24, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.