AB97 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 02, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Benitez-Thompson, Yeager, Ford

Revises provisions relating to evidence collected from and the reimbursement of payment for forensic medical examinations of victims of sexual assault. (BDR 15-538)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 431.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 08, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 12, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 03, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 22, 2017     05:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 01, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 02, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 03, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 01, 2017   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 569     Amend. No. 1131   

Bill History

Feb 02, 2017

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 03, 2017

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 14, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 569.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

Jun 01, 2017

Jun 02, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Jun 04, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1131.) To printer.

Jun 05, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1131 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 431.

Sections 1, 1.3, 2, 3.3 to 4, inclusive, 5, 6, and 8 of this act effective on October 1, 2017. Sections 1.7, 2.5, 3.1, and 4.5 of this bill effective on January 1, 2021.