AB99 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 02, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Araujo, Bilbray-Axelrod, Daly, Diaz, Monroe-Moreno, Neal, Sprinkle, Thompson, Yeager, Cancela, Spearman, Woodhouse

Revises provisions relating to services for children. (BDR 38-144)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 9.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb 20, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 03, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 13, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 22, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 15, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Mar 09, 2017   Yea 26,   Nay 15,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 04, 2017   Yea 18,   Nay 2,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 26     Amend. No. 86   

Bill History

Feb 02, 2017

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 03, 2017

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 07, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Mar 08, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 26.) To printer.

Mar 09, 2017

Mar 10, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Apr 03, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 86.) To printer.

Apr 04, 2017

Apr 05, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 86 concurred in. To enrollment.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 9.

Effective April 11, 2017, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and October 1, 2017, for all other purposes.