AJR13 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Swank

Expresses the support of the Nevada Legislature for the enactment and use of the Antiquities Act and the designation of the Basin and Range National Monument and the Gold Butte Monument in this State. (BDR R-1061)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 30.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr 11, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr 13, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Do pass
  Senate Natural Resources     May 02, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     May 11, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 25, 2017   Yea 27,   Nay 15,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 17, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 23, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Mar 24, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 17, 2017

  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 21, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

May 15, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2017

May 18, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 30.

Effective May 23, 2017.