AJR2 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 01, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Araujo, Elliot Anderson, Bilbray-Axelrod, Brooks, Carrillo, Diaz, Joiner, Monroe-Moreno, Ohrenschall, Sprinkle, Swank, Thompson, Yeager, Parks, Cancela, Ford, Manendo, Ratti, Segerblom, Woodhouse

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to require the recognition of all marriages regardless of gender. (BDR C-690)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 17.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 21, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 02, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass   Reconsidered of previous action on: 3-02-17   Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 22, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 12, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 05, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Mar 09, 2017   Yea 27,   Nay 14,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 01, 2017   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 23     Amend. No. 515   

Bill History

Feb 01, 2017

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 02, 2017

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 07, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Mar 08, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 23.) To printer.

Mar 09, 2017

Mar 10, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 25, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 515.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 27, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for Monday, May 1, 2017.

May 01, 2017

May 02, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 515 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 17.

Return to 2019 Session.