SB101 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 03, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Restricts the authority to inject neuromodulators derived from Clostridium botulinum and dermal and soft tissue fillers to certain medical professionals. (BDR 40-677)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 238.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 01, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 10, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 22, 2017   Yea 30,   Nay 11,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 59     Amend. No. 608     Amend. No. 666   

Bill History

Feb 03, 2017

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 59.) To printer.

Apr 12, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 608.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 18, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 666.) To printer.

May 19, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2017

May 23, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 666 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 25, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 238.

Effective July 1, 2017.