SB115 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Denis, Bilbray-Axelrod

Revises provisions concerning the prohibition against carrying or possessing certain weapons while on certain property. (BDR 15-279)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 28, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 16, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     May 09, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 21, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read second time.

Mar 21, 2017

Mar 22, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 20, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)