SB121 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodhouse, Parks, Ford, Denis, Farley, Atkinson, Cancela, Cannizzaro, Manendo, Ratti, Segerblom, Spearman

Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study concerning issues regarding the behavioral and cognitive care needs of older persons. (BDR S-63)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 522.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 22, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 26, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun 04, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 05, 2017     10:00 AM      Agenda            Heard   Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 04, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 125   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of exemption.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 125.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 13, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

Jun 04, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 05, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 522.
  • Effective July 1, 2017.