SB122 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cancela, Ratti, Cannizzaro, Parks, Woodhouse, Spiegel, Sprinkle

Establishes a program to provide grants for family planning services. (BDR 40-630)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 164.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 08, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     Apr 03, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     Apr 10, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 10, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 03, 2017     12:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 08, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 17, 2017   Yea 29,   Nay 13,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 579     Amend. No. 649   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 16, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 17, 2017

  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Mar 23, 2017

  • Notice of exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 579.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 15, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 16, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 649.) To printer.

May 17, 2017

May 18, 2017

  • In Senate.

May 19, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 649 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 164.

Effective May 26, 2017 for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.