SB133 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Harris

Revises the Uniform Deployed Parents Custody and Visitation Act. (BDR 11-571)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 163.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 27, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 02, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 20, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 11, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 08, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 18, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 06, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 07, 2017

  • Read second time.

Mar 08, 2017

Mar 09, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 11, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 163.
  • Effective July 1, 2017.