SB136 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodhouse, Ford, Atkinson, Parks, Manendo, Cancela, Cannizzaro, Denis, Farley, Hardy, Ratti, Segerblom, Spearman

Makes various changes concerning health care. (BDR 18-143)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
In Senate. To enrollment.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 03, 2017     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 10, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, and re-refer
  Senate Finance     May 01, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 03, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 19, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 22, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 16, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 636   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 28, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.

May 11, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 15, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 636.) To printer.

May 16, 2017

May 17, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.

May 24, 2017

May 25, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.