SB139 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Makes various changes to provisions relating to patient-centered medical homes. (BDR 40-679)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Exemption effective.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 20, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 27, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 107   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 28, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 107.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.