SB147 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Spearman

Authorizes tax credits for employers who assist employees in finding and paying for day care. (BDR 32-56)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Mar 02, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Apr 04, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 28, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)