SB151 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Manendo

Authorizes the establishment of a public health laboratory in certain counties. (BDR 40-752)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 08, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 08, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 19, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 19, 2017   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 280   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 280.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 23, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2017

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 27, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)