SB156 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodhouse

Revises provisions relating to the transportation of children in motor vehicles. (BDR 43-349)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Mar 02, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 07, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Transportation     Mar 09, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Transportation     Mar 16, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Transportation     Mar 28, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 11, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Transportation     May 16, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 14,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 103   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 928   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 07, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 103.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 18, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 19, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2017

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 27, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)